THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:35:19 PM
Major, Nathalie
CPSO#:
65108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Cook, Nathalie (used until: 08 Mar 2016 )
Major, Nathalie (used until: 25 Oct 1994 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-291-9520
Fax: 613-738-4878
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MAJOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1993 |