THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:36:03 PM
Humar, Atul
CPSO#:
65104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
PMB 11-175
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4241
Fax: (416) 340-4043
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATUL HUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2013 |