THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:23:58 AM
Teper, Shane Hillel
CPSO#:
65095
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
Queen Square Doctors
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANE HILLEL TEPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEPER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |