THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:53:46 AM
Luison, Fabio
CPSO#:
65086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
402-2009 Long Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 6C3
Phone: 7055235626
Fax: 7055230827
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:24 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FABIO LUISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUISON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 8 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1993 |