THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:38:23 PM
Graham, John Douglas
CPSO#:
65076
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1993 |