THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 16:08:55 PM
El-Helou, Philippe Philippe
CPSO#:
65074
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
39 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 1Y3
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 33998
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:03 Feb 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE PHILIPPE EL-HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-HELOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 18 Dec 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2001 |