THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:19:00 PM
Amimi, Myriam Nadia
CPSO#:
65064
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
677 Great Northern Road
Unit #1
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 5A1
Phone: (705) 942-5151
Fax: (705) 942-7421
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MYRIAM NADIA AMIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Internship - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1993 |