THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:10:08 PM
Opie, John William
CPSO#:
65011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave East, Hamilton ON
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33112
Fax: (905) 521-6017
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM OPIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1993 |