THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:10:02 AM
Berlie, Marie Carmen
CPSO#:
65007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Waskaganish CMC
2 Taktachun Meskaneu
PO Box 390
Waskaganish QC J0M 1R0
Phone: (819) 895-8833 Ext. 0
Fax: (819) 895-8866
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE CARMEN BERLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1996 |