THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:09:58 PM
Lingley, Michael David
CPSO#:
64935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 5358
Fax: (905) 853-2222
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID LINGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 29 Nov 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1998 |