THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:46:05 AM
Hill, Andrew Beverly
CPSO#:
64930
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
31 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
31-Oct-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Andrew B. Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:04 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 31 Oct 2019 |