THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:26:02 AM
Maur, Gurpreet Singh
CPSO#:
64924
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Rajasthan University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105-111 Granton Dr
Richmond Hill ON L4B 1L5
Phone: +1 877-718-219
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH MAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1992 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Oct 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2014 |