THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:18:33 AM
Moore, Wieslawa Hanna
CPSO#:
64901
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Apr 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish, Russian
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge , Ontario
L4H 2T2
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T2
Phone: (905) 264 8311
Fax: 905 264 0801
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WIESLAWA HANNA MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2013 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Apr 2013
Summary:
On April 12, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wieslawa Hanna Moore committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Moore met Mr. X in the spring of 2002, while Mr. X was completing a renovation contract at the clinic where she worked. Dr. Moore hired Mr. X to do renovations on her home in the summer of 2002. In 2002, Dr. Moore and Mr. X began a romantic and sexual relationship. Shortly thereafter, Mr. X moved into Dr. Moore's home with Dr. Moore and her daughter.
Between approximately 2002 and 2004, Dr. Moore provided isolated and incidental medical services to Mr. X, including sending Mr. X for testing and administering immunization shots. She did not inform Mr. X's family doctor about all of the care she provided. Dr. Moore did not bill OHIP for these services or maintain a patient chart. Dr. Moore states that the romantic relationship ended in or around March 2004. Between April 24, 2005 and July 28, 2005, Dr.Moore saw Mr. X as a patient at the clinic where she was employed on four occasions.
Between April 24, 2005 and December 29, 2005, Dr. Moore provided medical services to her daughter, Ms Y at the clinic where she worked. She also referred Ms Y to other physicians for follow up treatment and care. Dr. Moore billed OHIP for her services.
By providing medical treatment to Ms Y and Mr. X, Dr. Moore failed to recognize and maintain appropriate boundaries, and caused potential confusion as to whether she was acting in a professional or personal role in providing medical treatment.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
Dr. Moore appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration of Dr. Moore:
(i) Dr. Moore must successfully complete, at her own expense, the College's Understanding Boundaries in Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship course, within 12 months of the date of this Order.
Dr. Moore pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 12, 2013