THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:03:50 PM
Bush, Keith John
CPSO#:
64872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
206 - 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON L2R 2Z9
Phone: 9056858400
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Bush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Bush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 20 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 Aug 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEITH JOHN BUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 1992 |