THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:55:00 PM
Rowlands, Donna Rae
CPSO#:
64857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Mar 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
51-85 Main Street
Burin NL A0E1E0
Phone: 709-891-1040
Fax: 709-891-3250
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Rowlands Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to Dr. Donna Rae Rowlands at: Burin Peninsula Health Care Centre, P.O. Box 340, 51-85 Main Street, Burin, Newfoundland, A0E 1E0.
Date Received: 19 Dec 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONNA RAE ROWLANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWLANDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 17 Mar 1992 to 13 Apr 1992
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Apr 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Oct 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 1998 |