THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:23:34 AM
Morrissey, Jean-Pierre Patrick
CPSO#:
64839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
292 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1L 6B7
Phone: (613) 745-5651
Fax: (613) 745-7947
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEAN-PIERRE PATRICK MORRISSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISSEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Mar 1992 to 30 Apr 1992
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1992 |