THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:18:40 AM
Roldan Lozano, Luis Oscar
CPSO#:
64822
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad De El Salvador, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Roldan Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Jan 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jan 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 05 Feb 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 05 Feb 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |