THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:23:39 AM
Seyone, Chanth
CPSO#:
64818
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Zambia, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Elgin Mills Professional Centre
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 212
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Phone: 905-237-4814
Fax: 905-237-4815
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 Feb 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHANTH SEYONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEYONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 04 Feb 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 04 Feb 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 04 Feb 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Feb 1998
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 1997 |