THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:45:12 PM
Pastolero, Gemma Coronel
CPSO#:
64808
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of the Philippines, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Pastolero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Indiana
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:06 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 Jan 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 29 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Jan 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 29 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Jan 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2018 |