THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:48:29 AM
Haney, Marie Marthe Isabel
CPSO#:
64790
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Sep 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
3950 14th Avenue
Markham ON L3R 0A9
Phone: (905) 305-1700
Fax: (905) 305-1706
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE MARTHE ISABEL HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1994 |