THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:42:13 AM
Heon, Elise
CPSO#:
64784
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Dec 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Elise Heon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:26 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELISE HEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1995 |