THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:34:47 PM
Webber, Gail Colleen
CPSO#:
64775
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Access Service Canada Inc (RASCI)
277 Lakeshore Rd E, Suite 400
Oakville, ON, L6J6J3
Tel: (800) 971-8038
Fax: (800) 928-2503
https://www.rasci.ca/contact
Date Received: 21 Mar 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAIL COLLEEN WEBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBBER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 15 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Other - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1993 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Jan 1994 |