THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:38:35 PM
Lee, Julietta Chee Ting
CPSO#:
64751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 319
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 284-7227
Fax: (416) 284-7102
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:15 Feb 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIETTA CHEE TING LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Feb 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1996 |