THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:21:29 AM
Malik, Saleem Tahir Ahmad
CPSO#:
64741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 8076846944
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Saleem Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALEEM TAHIR AHMAD MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1995 |