THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:37:59 PM
Urfer, Francois-Nicolas
CPSO#:
64728
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Lausanne, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Societe Professionnelle de Medecine Francois Urfer
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Dec 1992
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2017 |