THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:39:32 AM
Voruganti, Sachi Mahita
CPSO#:
64713
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu
Education: Andhra Medical College, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
699 Concession St
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Voruganti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 May 2023 |