THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:03:31 AM
Guo, Lin-Rui
CPSO#:
64709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Shanxi Medical College, Taiyun, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
LHSC University Hospital
B6-112
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3468
Fax: (519) 663-3477
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:13 Apr 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Apr 1992
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Apr 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Apr 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 13 Apr 1995
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 1998 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2000 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Jul 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2023 |
|
Active |