THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:19:51 PM
Albuquerque, Joy Maria
CPSO#:
64685
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond St.
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 5418
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOY MARIA ALBUQUERQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBUQUERQUE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1991 |