THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:22:59 AM
Oshidari, Alborz
CPSO#:
64671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Iranian, Persian
Education: National University of Iran, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
520 Sutherland Drive
Lyndhurst Hospital
Toronto ON M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6129
Fax: (416) 422-5402
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALBORZ OSHIDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSHIDARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1994 |