THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 14:11:31 PM
Mattar, Nabih
CPSO#:
64669
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Oct 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: National University of Ireland, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nabih Mattar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Te: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 18 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2017 |