THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:12:47 PM
Jaeger, Melanie Terais
CPSO#:
64665
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELANIE TERAIS JAEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAEGER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1991 |