THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:06:31 AM
Blondal, John August
CPSO#:
64635
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joesph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6586
Fax: (416) 530-6356
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:02 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN AUGUST BLONDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLONDAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1991 |