THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:04:28 PM
Tewfik, Sherif
CPSO#:
64633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Fairview Mall
Suite 334
PO Box 239
1800 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2J 5A7
Phone: (416) 499-7337
Fax: (416) 499-7339
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERIF TEWFIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEWFIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Sep 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 13 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1998 |