THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:05:00 PM
Lapinsky, Stephen Earl
CPSO#:
64625
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18 214
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3211
Fax: (416) 586-8480
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EARL LAPINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPINSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1993 |