THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:20:30 AM
Wong, Kwong Wai Raimond
CPSO#:
64611
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: 905-575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:31 Aug 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KWONG WAI RAIMOND WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1995 |