THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:48:20 PM
Taher, Fakhruddin
CPSO#:
64606
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 905 848 7100
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAKHRUDDIN TAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Aug 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1993 |