THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:18:50 PM
Kagan, Rhoda Sheryl
CPSO#:
64572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 492-5888
Fax: (416) 492-6569
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:03 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RHODA SHERYL KAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |