THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 21:03:20 PM
Sapir, Daniel
CPSO#:
64566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leicester, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2435 Ninth Line
Oakville ON L6H 7G9
Phone: (289) 725-8910
Fax: (289) 725-8066
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:06 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL SAPIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1995 |