THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:27:56 PM
Johnson, Manamohan John
CPSO#:
64559
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System at
Etobicoke General Hospital and
Brampton Civic Hospital
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANAMOHAN JOHN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 30 Aug 1991 to 31 Jul 1992
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1992 |