THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:17:21 PM
El-Beheiry, Hossam El-Din Mohamed Ahmed
CPSO#:
64554
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Trillium
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOSSAM EL-DIN MOHAMED AHMED EL-BEHEIRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BEHEIRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1995 |