THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:29:24 PM
Garcia Ameijeiras, Maria De Los Angeles
CPSO#:
64549
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad Autonoma De Barcelona, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Garcia Ameijeiras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For Inactive files please contact Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
For Active files please contact Dr. Dallas Seitz, Providence Care, 752 King Street West, Kingston, ON K7L 4X3
Date Received: 05 Oct 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 1997 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Oct 2016 |