THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:20:12 AM
Roy, Madan Mohan
CPSO#:
64517
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Feb 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Bangalore University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
3A93
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75689
Fax: (905) 521-4981
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MADAN MOHAN ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 1996 |