THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:08:37 PM
Roitman, Daryl Scott
CPSO#:
64488
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto ON M2J 1V1
Phone: (647) 352-3674
Fax: (647) 352-3673
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:12 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARYL SCOTT ROITMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1991 |