THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:45:28 AM
Rajgopal, Chellappa
CPSO#:
64461
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Osmania Medical College, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. Rajgopal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Command Services (London) Limited
Piccadilly Street
London, ON N6A 1R8
Date Received: 12 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2019 |