THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:42:38 PM
Harfa, Leah
CPSO#:
64452
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Monash University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8133
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEAH HARFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARFA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1997 |