THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:29:00 PM
Peng, Philip Wenn-Hsin
CPSO#:
64434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Jul 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP WENN-HSIN PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1995 |