THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:18:24 PM
Senthelal, Sentheshanmuganathan
CPSO#:
64433
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Sinhalese, Tamil
Education: Taskent Medical Institute, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5000
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:27 May 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SENTHESHANMUGANATHAN SENTHELAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHELAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 30 Mar 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Other - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2004 |