THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:31:06 AM
Pasricha, Ajai Kumar
CPSO#:
64430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
203-7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON L3R 1A3
Phone: (905) 943-7382
Fax: (905) 943-9105
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AJAI KUMAR PASRICHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASRICHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1992 |