THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:33:19 AM
Bergstrome, Brant Eric
CPSO#:
64412
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Hamburg University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2043
Fax: (705) 549-3652
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRANT ERIC BERGSTROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGSTROME is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1991 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1995 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2000 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 02 Oct 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2000
Summary:
On March 8, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Bergstrome(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee subsequently ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Bergstrome be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register;
2. Dr. Bergstrome(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months, to commence on April 1, 2000, six months of which will be suspended if Dr. Bergstrome fulfills the following conditions:
(a) that he attend at his own cost, a program satisfactory to the Registrar on boundary violations and provide proof to the Registrar of having attended and competed such a program; and
(b) that upon his return to practise and for a period of six months thereafter, he shall maintain, at his own expense, a peer relationship with a senior psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar which shall involve monthly discussions of boundaries and other clinical issues. Such senior psychiatrist shall provide a report to the Registrar at the end of each three month period that Dr. Bergstrome has attended upon him or her and participated in such discussions.
3. In the event that the Registrar is notified of a breach of any of the above conditions, the certificate of registration shall be suspended for the balance of the twelve month term, i.e., a further six months.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 08, 2000