THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:07:15 AM
Malak, Mohamed Nabil
CPSO#:
64411
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
12 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Jun-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Tours, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr Jacinthe Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Mar 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 12 Jun 2017 |